PA HB24 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 9, 1999 (P.L.1, No.1), known as the Capital Facilities Debt Enabling Act, in capital facilities, further providing for bonds, issue of bonds and notes, maturity and interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In capital facilities, further providing for bonds, issue of bonds and notes, maturity and interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 24 PN 1735, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 24 PN 1735, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00721 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02SenateAct No. 43
2019-07-02SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-28SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-27SenateSigned in House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as committed
2019-05-17SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-07SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as amended
2019-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-27HouseReported as committed
2019-02-05HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=24
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0024&pn=0341
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0024&pn=1735
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=221
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=438
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=264
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=250

Bill Comments

feedback