PA HB241 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in resource enhancement and protection tax credit, further providing for definitions and for Resource Enhancement and Protection Tax Credit Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In resource enhancement and protection tax credit, further providing for definitions and for Resource Enhancement and Protection Tax Credit Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 241 PN 211, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-26HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-18HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=241
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0241&pn=0211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=771
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=933
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=607

Bill Comments

feedback