PA HB2413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for COVID-19 response transfers for assistance to the Commonwealth's volunteer service organizations; and making an appropriation.
Title
In additional special funds and restricted accounts, providing for COVID-19 response transfers for assistance to the Commonwealth's volunteer service organizations; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3646, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3572, 2019 A5276, BURNS (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3572, 2019 A5276, SUSP RULES, BURNS (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3572, 2019 A5193, SNYDER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3646, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3572, 2019 A5276, BURNS (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3572, 2019 A5276, SUSP RULES, BURNS (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2413 PN 3572, 2019 A5193, SNYDER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to FINANCE |