PA HB2415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for COVID-19 emergency statutory and regulatory suspensions and waivers reporting requirements.
Title
Providing for COVID-19 emergency statutory and regulatory suspensions and waivers reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2415 PN 3578, FP (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2415 PN 3578, FP (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (128-74) |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-27 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |