PA HB2431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for local taxation on real property, for reopening of 2019-2020 school district budgets and for charter school tuition rate for the 2020-2021 school year.
Title
In emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for local taxation on real property, for reopening of 2019-2020 school district budgets and for charter school tuition rate for the 2020-2021 school year.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Bryan Cutler [R] | Rep. Andrew Lewis [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Rep. Melinda Fee [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05359 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05345 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05359 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05345 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-23 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |