PA HB2433 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-09 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-09 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. James Marshall [R] | Rep. James Rigby [R] | Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R] | Rep. Eric Nelson [R] |
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2433 PN 3665, FP (Y: 112 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05275 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2433 PN 3665, FP (Y: 112 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05275 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2020-05-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (112-90) |
2020-05-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-04 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |