PA HB2435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Food Establishment Personal Protective Equipment Reimbursement Grant Program.
Title
Providing for Food Establishment Personal Protective Equipment Reimbursement Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2435 PN 3674, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2435 PN 3611, 2019 A5332, WHITE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2435 PN 3674, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2435 PN 3611, 2019 A5332, WHITE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |