PA HB2437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for health care facility reporting relating to COVID-19 and for duties of the Department of Health and the Department of Human Services.
Title
Providing for health care facility reporting relating to COVID-19 and for duties of the Department of Health and the Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A06202 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 3920, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 3851, 2019 A5966, RYAN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 3851, 2019 A5987, STEPHENS (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A05852 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 3920, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 3851, 2019 A5966, RYAN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2437 PN 3851, 2019 A5987, STEPHENS (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A05852 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-27 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |