PA HB2438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 98
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 98
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for broadband services.
Title
Providing for broadband services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2438 PN 4545, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2438 PN 4545, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2438 PN 3848, A7198, PITTMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-7198 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2438 PN 3848, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05840 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2438 PN 4545, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2438 PN 4545, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2438 PN 3848, A7198, PITTMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-7198 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2438 PN 3848, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05840 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Act No. 98 |
2020-10-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-10-21 | House | In the House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (31-18) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |
2020-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-27 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |