PA HB2455 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for COVID-19 emergency testing plan and reporting and for water and sewer authorities in cities of the second class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for COVID-19 emergency testing plan and reporting and for water and sewer authorities in cities of the second class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2455 PN 4059, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2455 PN 4059, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05439 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2455 PN 3697, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2455 PN 3639, 2019 A5312, LAWRENCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2455 PN 3639, 2019 A5363, CUTLER (Y: 132 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2455 PN 3639, 2019 A5363, SUSP RULES, CUTLER (Y: 110 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23HouseAct No. 70
2020-07-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-07-13HousePresented to the Governor
2020-07-13HouseSigned in Senate
2020-07-07HouseSigned in House
2020-07-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (197-4)
2020-07-07HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-07-07HouseReferred to RULES
2020-06-30HouseIn the House
2020-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-30SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-06-30SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-23SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-23SenateReported as amended
2020-05-25SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2020-05-04SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-1)
2020-05-04HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-04-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-27HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-27HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-27HouseReported as committed
2020-04-27HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2455
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2455&pn=3639
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2455&pn=3693
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2455&pn=3697
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2455&pn=4009
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2455&pn=4059
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/27/2020&RollCallId=1845
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/27/2020&RollCallId=1846
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1238
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1239
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1249
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/04/2020&RollCallId=1934
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/04/2020&RollCallId=1933
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=1006
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/30/2020&RollCallId=1051
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1481
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2336

Bill Comments

feedback