PA HB2460 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, further providing for interim assessment, duplicate and warrant, for discounts, penalties and notice, and for collectors required to be in attendance.
Title
Further providing for interim assessment, duplicate and warrant, for discounts, penalties and notice, and for collectors required to be in attendance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05782 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05782 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |