PA HB2478 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in financial responsibility, further providing for required financial responsibility.
Title
In financial responsibility, further providing for required financial responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2478 PN 3700, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2478 PN 3700, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-1) |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-30 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |