PA HB2488 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05904 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05904 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to HEALTH |