PA HB2489 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions relating to extension of waiver provisions for outdoor recreational activities.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions relating to extension of waiver provisions for outdoor recreational activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3773, 2019 A5798, GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3773, 2019 A5795, MILLARD (Y: 118 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3773, 2019 A5792, QUINN (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05584 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3773, 2019 A5798, GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3773, 2019 A5795, MILLARD (Y: 118 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2489 PN 3773, 2019 A5792, QUINN (Y: 128 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05584 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |