PA HB2506 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for establishment outdoor space operation.
Title
Providing for establishment outdoor space operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2506 PN 3777, FP (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2506 PN 3734, 2019 A5738, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2506 PN 3734, 2019 A5640, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2506 PN 3777, FP (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2506 PN 3734, 2019 A5738, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2506 PN 3734, 2019 A5640, EVERETT (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2020-05-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (133-69) |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |