PA HB2530 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 9, 2002 (P.L.1701, No.214), known as the Religious Freedom Protection Act, further providing for free exercise of religion protection.
Title
Further providing for free exercise of religion protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2530 PN 3782, FP (Y: 149 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2530 PN 3782, MOT CONST, HARRIS (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2530 PN 3782, FP (Y: 149 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2530 PN 3782, MOT CONST, HARRIS (Y: 133 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-09-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (149-53) |
2020-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |