PA HB2540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, establishing the State Epidemiology Advisory Council; and making an appropriation.
Title
Establishing the State Epidemiology Advisory Council; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 4079, FP (Y: 198 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 3805, 2019 A5927, HARRIS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 3805, 2019 A5920, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 3805, 2019 A5918, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 4079, FP (Y: 198 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 3805, 2019 A5927, HARRIS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 3805, 2019 A5920, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2540 PN 3805, 2019 A5918, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-07-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-3) |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-20 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |