PA HB2541 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for countywide reopening plan for businesses.
Title
Providing for countywide reopening plan for businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2541 PN 3809, FP (Y: 114 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-07-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (114-87) |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-08 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-20 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |