PA HB2543 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for COVID-19 testing in long-term care facilities and for duties of the Department of Health and Department of Human Services.
Title
Providing for COVID-19 testing in long-term care facilities and for duties of the Department of Health and Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06535 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06535 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-07-07 | House | First consideration |
2020-07-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-05-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |