PA HB2548 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1987 (P.L.246, No.47), known as the Municipalities Financial Recovery Act, in municipal financial distress, providing for emergency plan extension.
Title
In municipal financial distress, providing for emergency plan extension.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. Joseph Webster [D] | Rep. Brian Kirkland [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2548 PN 4339, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2548 PN 3832, 2019 A6841, FREEMAN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2548 PN 4339, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2548 PN 3832, 2019 A6841, FREEMAN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2020-09-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-02 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |