PA HB2549 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Third consideration and final passage (116-85)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for COVID-19 countywide reopening plan for businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for COVID-19 countywide reopening plan for businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2549 PN 4077, FP (Y: 116 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06546 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-85)
2020-07-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-13HouseSecond consideration
2020-07-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-07-07HouseFirst consideration
2020-07-07HouseReported as amended
2020-05-26HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2549
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2549&pn=3824
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2549&pn=4077
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2329
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2330
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/13/2020&RollCallId=2358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1526
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=2387

Bill Comments

feedback