PA HB2553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-28 - Re-referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-28 - Re-referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, establishing the SNAP Healthy Bucks Incentive Program.
Title
In public assistance, establishing the SNAP Healthy Bucks Incentive Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - House - House Human Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-28 | House | Re-referred to HEALTH |
2020-08-28 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to HEALTH |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |