PA HB2561 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 6, 1980 (P.L.197, No.57), known as the Optometric Practice and Licensure Act, further providing for definitions, for approval of drugs, for exemptions and exceptions and for violations and penalties.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for approval of drugs, for exemptions and exceptions and for violations and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2561 PN 4373, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2561 PN 4373, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A07134 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2561 PN 4373, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2561 PN 4373, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A07134 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 99 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2020-09-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-17 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-15 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-06-08 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |