PA HB257 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of assault by prisoner.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of assault by prisoner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 257 PN 3053, FP (Y: 144 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 257 PN 2920, 2019 A4053, KAUFFMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03085 (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 257 PN 3053, FP (Y: 144 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 257 PN 2920, 2019 A4053, KAUFFMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03085 (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-12-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (144-53) |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |