PA HB2579 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 43976, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 1010 over Chatham Run, Pine Creek Township, Clinton County, as the Tech. Corporal Lee R. Phillips Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 43976, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 1010 over Chatham Run, Pine Creek Township, Clinton County, as the Tech. Corporal Lee R. Phillips Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2579 PN 3918, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2579 PN 3918, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-09-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-01 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |