PA HB2598 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of February 27, 1868 (P.L.43, No.9), entitled "An act to declare the true intent and meaning of the eleventh section of an act to provide for the reduction of the public debt, approved April twenty-second, Anno Domini one thousand eight hundred and forty-six."
Title
Repealing the act of February 27, 1868 (P.L.43, No.9), entitled "An act to declare the true intent and meaning of the eleventh section of an act to provide for the reduction of the public debt, approved April twenty-second, Anno Domini one thousand eight hundred and forty-six."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2598 PN 3928, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2598 PN 3928, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-09-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-16 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-02 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-09-02 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to FINANCE |