PA HB2615 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 14 over Fall Brook, Troy Borough, Bradford County, as the Troy Area Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 14 over Fall Brook, Troy Borough, Bradford County, as the Troy Area Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2615 PN 3943, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-09-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |