PA HB262 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in inheritance tax, further providing for inheritance tax rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In inheritance tax, further providing for inheritance tax rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 262 PN 233, FP (Y: 180 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00140 (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-04-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (180-18)
2019-04-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-27HouseReported as committed
2019-01-29HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=262
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0262&pn=0233
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=218
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/15/2019&RollCallId=270

Bill Comments

feedback