PA HB264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 264 PN 361, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Floor: HB 264 PN 361, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 264 PN 235, 2019 A47, MAKO (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateAct No. 4
2019-05-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-04-23SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned in Senate
2019-04-10SenateSigned in House
2019-04-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-27SenateSecond consideration
2019-03-26SenateFirst consideration
2019-03-26SenateReported as committed
2019-02-08SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-02-06SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2019-02-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-04HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-04HouseReported as committed
2019-01-29HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=264
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0264&pn=0235
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0264&pn=0361
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=01/30/2019&RollCallId=7
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/06/2019&RollCallId=21
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=28
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=58
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=89
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=44

Bill Comments

feedback