PA HB265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for career information and recruitment; in terms and courses of study, further providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence; in vocational education, further providing for advisory committees, providing for a workforce development program clearinghouse and for PAsmart online career resource center, further providing for career and technical education equipment grants and providing for utilization of credits; establishing the Schools-to-Work Program and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry; providing for classification of program code; in transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, further providing for definitions, for duties of public institutions of higher education and State-related institutions, for Transfer and Articulation Oversight Committee and for duties of department; replacing references to "vocational-technical" with "career and technical," replacing references to "vocational" with "career and technical" and replacing references to "vocation" with "career and technical"; deleting references to vocational school districts; and renaming the State Board for Vocational Education as the State Board of Career and Technical Education.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for career information and recruitment; in terms and courses of study, further providing for Commission for Agricultural Education Excellence; in vocational education, further providing for advisory committees, providing for a workforce development program clearinghouse and for PAsmart online career resource center, further providing for career and technical education equipment grants and providing for utilization of credits; establishing the Schools-to-Work Program and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry; providing for classification of program code; in transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, further providing for definitions, for duties of public institutions of higher education and State-related institutions, for Transfer and Articulation Oversight Committee and for duties of department; replacing references to "vocational-technical" with "career and technical," replacing references to "vocational" with "career and technical" and replacing references to "vocation" with "career and technical"; deleting references to vocational school districts; and renaming the State Board for Vocational Education as the State Board of Career and Technical Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2579, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 265 PN 2579, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2286, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2241, 2019 A2629, DERMODY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2241, 2019 A2629, SUSP RULES, DERMODY (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 265 PN 2241, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 236, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2579, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 265 PN 2579, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2286, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2241, 2019 A2629, DERMODY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 2241, 2019 A2629, SUSP RULES, DERMODY (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 265 PN 2241, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 265 PN 236, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Act No. 76 |
2019-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-10-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-10-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-09-25 | House | Signed in House |
2019-09-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the Senate (197-0) |
2019-09-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-09-25 | House | In the House |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0) |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (197-0) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-06-27 | House | In the House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-03-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |