PA HB2674 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Allegheny Township, Blair County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Allegheny Township, Blair County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2674 PN 4099, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2674 PN 4099, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-09-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-07-08 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |