PA HB275 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 10, 1987 (P.L.246, No.47), known as the Municipalities Financial Recovery Act, in Early Intervention Program, further providing for definitions, for program objectives and for authorization; in municipal financial distress, further providing for limitation of status; and making an editorial change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Early Intervention Program, further providing for definitions, for program objectives and for authorization; in municipal financial distress, further providing for limitation of status; and making an editorial change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 275 PN 246, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Floor: HB 275 PN 246, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct No. 6
2019-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-04SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-04SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-04SenateSigned in House
2019-06-03SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-04-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-27SenateSecond consideration
2019-03-26SenateFirst consideration
2019-03-26SenateReported as committed
2019-02-08SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-02-06SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2019-02-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-05HouseSecond consideration
2019-02-04HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-04HouseReported as committed
2019-01-29HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=275
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0275&pn=0246
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=01/30/2019&RollCallId=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=29
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/06/2019&RollCallId=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=59
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=90
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=84

Bill Comments

feedback