PA HB279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in particular rights and immunities, further providing for rescue from motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In particular rights and immunities, further providing for rescue from motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 279 PN 1330, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 279 PN 1330, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 279 PN 247, 2019 A274, BOBACK (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateAct No. 5
2019-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-05-08SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-05-08SenateSigned in Senate
2019-05-08SenateSigned in House
2019-05-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-05-06SenateSecond consideration
2019-05-01SenateFirst consideration
2019-05-01SenateReported as committed
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-08HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-03-27HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-12HouseReported as committed
2019-01-29HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=279
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0279&pn=0247
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0279&pn=1330
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=78
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=159
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=05/01/2019&RollCallId=138
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=80

Bill Comments

feedback