PA HB288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of concealing death of child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of concealing death of child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 288 PN 261, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 288 PN 261, 2019 A271, D. MILLER (Y: 91 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-08HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-27HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-12HouseReported as committed
2019-01-30HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=288
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0288&pn=0261
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=80
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=147
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=160
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2019&RollCallId=253

Bill Comments

feedback