PA HB295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS; and providing for the duties of the Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS; and providing for the duties of the Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 295 PN 268, FP (Y: 142 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 295 PN 268, 2019 A2521, FRANKEL (Y: 93 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (142-58)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-26HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-04HouseReported as committed
2019-01-30HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=295
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0295&pn=0268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=586
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=934
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=611
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=978

Bill Comments

feedback