PA HB297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for career information and recruitment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, providing for career information and recruitment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 1003, FP (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 270, 2019 A319, HARKINS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 297 PN 270, 2019 A278, MAKO (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as amended
2019-03-28SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-1)
2019-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-11HouseReported as committed
2019-01-30HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=297
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0297&pn=0270
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0297&pn=1003
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0297&pn=2093
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=03/11/2019&RollCallId=66
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=101
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2019&RollCallId=159
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=270

Bill Comments

feedback