PA HB298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Older Adult Mentor Volunteer Program; and providing for duties of the Department of Education, the State Board of Education, intermediate units and public school entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Older Adult Mentor Volunteer Program; and providing for duties of the Department of Education, the State Board of Education, intermediate units and public school entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-12HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-12HouseReported as committed
2019-04-17HouseRe-referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2019-04-17HouseReported with request to re-refer to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2019-01-30HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback