PA HB3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-12)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for health insurance markets oversight; and establishing the Pennsylvania Health Insurance Exchange Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for health insurance markets oversight; and establishing the Pennsylvania Health Insurance Exchange Fund.

Sponsors

Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Frank Dermody [D]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]
Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Dan Moul [R]
Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. Kevin Boyle [D]Rep. Matthew Bradford [D]
Rep. Timothy Briggs [D]Rep. Donna Bullock [D]Rep. Danilo Burgos [D]Rep. Frank Burns [D]
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D]Rep. Mike Carroll [D]Rep. Morgan Cephas [D]Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D]
Rep. Carolyn Comitta [D]Rep. Scott Conklin [D]Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D]Rep. Margo Davidson [D]
Rep. Austin Davis [D]Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]Rep. David Delloso [D]
Rep. Maria Donatucci [D]Rep. Martin Flynn [D]Rep. Dan Frankel [D]Rep. Robert Freeman [D]
Rep. Edward Gainey [D]Rep. John Galloway [D]Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Liz Hanbidge [D]
Rep. Patrick Harkins [D]Rep. Christopher Harris [R]Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]Rep. Kristine Howard [D]
Rep. Sara Innamorato [D]Rep. Mary Isaacson [D]Rep. Movita Johnson-Harrell [D]Rep. Patty Kim [D]
Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]Rep. Brian Kirkland [D]Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Bridget Kosierowski [D]
Rep. Leanne Krueger-Braneky [D]Rep. Anita Kulik [D]Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Steven Malagari [D]
Rep. Brandon Markosek [D]Rep. Robert Matzie [D]Rep. Stephen McCarter [D]Rep. Joanna McClinton [D]
Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Robert Merski [D]Rep. Gerald Mullery [D]Rep. Kyle Mullins [D]
Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Jennifer O'Mara [D]Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D]
Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. James Roebuck [D]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]
Rep. Ben Sanchez [D]Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Melissa Shusterman [D]Rep. Brian Sims [D]
Rep. Pam Snyder [D]Rep. Jared Solomon [D]Rep. Michael Sturla [D]Rep. Perry Warren [D]
Rep. Joseph Webster [D]Rep. Jake Wheatley [D]Rep. Michael Zabel [D]Rep. Isabella Fitzgerald [D]
Rep. Wendy Ullman [D]Rep. Gregory Vitali [D]Rep. Dan Williams [D]Rep. Pamela DeLissio [D]
Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]Rep. Jason Dawkins [D]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]
Rep. Stephen Samuelson [D]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Maureen Madden [D]Rep. Malcolm Kenyatta [D]
Rep. Torren Ecker [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 3 PN 2211, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 3 PN 2211, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 3 PN 2065, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 3 PN 1995, 2019 A1685, CUTLER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAct No. 42
2019-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-28HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-28HouseSigned in House
2019-06-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (197-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-27HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-27HouseIn the House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as amended
2019-06-14SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-1)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as committed
2019-06-04HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=3
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0003&pn=1995
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0003&pn=2065
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0003&pn=2211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=635
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=651
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=711
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=383
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=437
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=249
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=991
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=639

Bill Comments

feedback