PA HB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to supervision, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants; and, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for fees, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants and further providing for definition.
Title
In departmental powers and duties as to supervision, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants; and, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for fees, providing for Keystone STARS Program participants and further providing for definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 309 PN 289, 2019 A506, MEHAFFIE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 309 PN 289, 2019 A506, MEHAFFIE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-11 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |