PA HB321 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-9)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, further providing for definitions; in minors, further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; and, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving sexual abuse of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, further providing for definitions; in minors, further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; and, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving sexual abuse of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-12-16 - House - HB 321 PN 2693, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-12-09 - Senate - HB 321 PN 2693, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - HB 321 PN 746, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-12-18HouseAct No. 105
2013-12-18HouseApproved by the Governor
2013-12-18HousePresented to the Governor
2013-12-17HouseSigned in Senate
2013-12-16HouseSigned in House
2013-12-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (197-0)
2013-12-16HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2013-12-10HouseReferred to RULES
2013-12-09HouseIn the House
2013-12-09SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2013-12-03SenateRe-reported as committed
2013-11-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-11-20SenateSecond consideration
2013-11-19SenateFirst consideration
2013-11-19SenateReported as amended
2013-03-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2013-03-12SenateIn the Senate
2013-03-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2013-03-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2013-03-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-03-11HouseSecond consideration
2013-02-13HouseRemoved from table
2013-02-12HouseLaid on the table
2013-02-12HouseFirst consideration
2013-02-12HouseReported as amended
2013-01-24HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2013&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=321
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=0328
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=0746
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=0328
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=0746
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=2693
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=88
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=11/19/2013&rNbr=592
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/03/2013&rNbr=620
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=976

Bill Comments

feedback