PA HB321 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 16, 1992 (P.L.155, No.28), known as the Assessors Certification Act, repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability and providing for certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability and providing for certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-10-06 - House - House Floor: HB 321 PN 341, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-09SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2015-10-06SenateIn the Senate
2015-10-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2015-10-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-09-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-09-30HouseSecond consideration
2015-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2015-06-24HouseLaid on the table
2015-06-24HouseRemoved from table
2015-05-12HouseLaid on the table
2015-05-12HouseFirst consideration
2015-05-12HouseReported as committed
2015-02-04HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=321
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0321&pn=0341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=05/12/2015&rNbr=342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/05/2015&rNbr=954
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=748
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=05/12/2015&RollCallId=342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/05/2015&RollCallId=954

Bill Comments

feedback