PA HB325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in distilleries, wineries, bonded warehouses, bailees for hire and transporters for hire, establishing the Pennsylvania Distilled Spirits Industry Promotion Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In distilleries, wineries, bonded warehouses, bailees for hire and transporters for hire, establishing the Pennsylvania Distilled Spirits Industry Promotion Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 325 PN 303, FP (Y: 185 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-03-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (185-9)
2019-03-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-11HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-11HouseReported as committed
2019-02-01HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback