PA HB33 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 62
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 62
Summary
An Act authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources and the Governor, to lease to Pine Township, Clearfield County, a certain tract of land situate in Pine Township, Clearfield County, for a consideration of $1.
Title
An Act authorizing and directing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources and the Governor, to lease to Pine Township, Clearfield County, a certain tract of land situate in Pine Township, Clearfield County, for a consideration of $1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-11-13 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-11-13 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-10-30 | Signed in House | |
2007-10-24 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-15 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-02 | First consideration | |
2007-10-02 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-22 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-05-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-21 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-07 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-07 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as amended | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=33 |