PA HB33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for definitions, for general assistance-related categorically needy and medically needy only medical assistance programs, for the medically needy and determination of eligibility and for medical assistance payments for institutional care; in hospital assessments, further providing for definitions, for authorization, for administration, for no hold harmless, for tax exemption and for time period; and, in Statewide quality care assessment, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for definitions, for general assistance-related categorically needy and medically needy only medical assistance programs, for the medically needy and determination of eligibility and for medical assistance payments for institutional care; in hospital assessments, further providing for definitions, for authorization, for administration, for no hold harmless, for tax exemption and for time period; and, in Statewide quality care assessment, further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 2182, FP (Y: 106 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 2182, 2019 A2194, SUSP RULES, DELISSIO (Y: 91 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02102 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A531, FIEDLER (Y: 87 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A536, DELISSIO (Y: 88 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A535, DAWKINS (Y: 87 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A624, ULLMAN (Y: 87 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A533, FRANKEL (Y: 87 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A543, KENYATTA (Y: 87 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00484 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00442 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00439 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00438 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00437 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00433 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00429 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00428 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as committed
2019-06-21SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (106-95)
2019-06-18HouseRe-reported as amended
2019-03-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-27HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-26HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-25HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=33
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0033&pn=0047
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0033&pn=2182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=180
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=181
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=183
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=184
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=186
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=187
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=03/25/2019&RollCallId=188
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=138
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=139
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=142
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=143
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=828
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=505
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=396

Bill Comments

feedback