PA HB332 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in jurisdiction of appellate courts, providing for commerce court program; and, in organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, providing for commerce courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In jurisdiction of appellate courts, providing for commerce court program; and, in organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, providing for commerce courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 332 PN 1677, FP (Y: 125 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 332 PN 310, 2019 A633, GROVE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-05-06SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (125-67)
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-12HouseReported as committed
2019-02-01HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=332
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0332&pn=0310
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0332&pn=1677
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=79
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=230
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=444

Bill Comments

feedback