PA HB342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 1, 2004 (P.L.1766, No.227), entitled "An act authorizing cities of the first class that have adopted a home rule charter to enforce ordinances, rules and regulations prohibiting dumping or disposal of waste, trash or debris," further providing for enforcement of trash laws.
Title
Amending the act of December 1, 2004 (P.L.1766, No.227), entitled "An act authorizing cities of the first class that have adopted a home rule charter to enforce ordinances, rules and regulations prohibiting dumping or disposal of waste, trash or debris," further providing for enforcement of trash laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 342 PN 1818, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01249 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 342 PN 1818, FP (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01249 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-09-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-0) |
2019-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |