PA HB350 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 24, 1984 (P.L.92, No.17), referred to as the Precious Metal Sale Regulation Law, further providing for definitions, for license required, for records of transactions, for dealer's retention of precious metal and availability for inspection, for purchases from minors and for penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for license required, for records of transactions, for dealer's retention of precious metal and availability for inspection, for purchases from minors and for penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 350 PN 566, FP (Y: 190 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 350 PN 566, 2019 A165, FARRY (Y: 189 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 350 PN 566, 2019 A165, SUSP RULES, FARRY (Y: 185 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Floor: HB 350 PN 276, 2019 A99, JOZWIAK (Y: 99 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-03-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-12HouseFinal passage (190-5)
2019-03-12HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2019-03-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-02-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-02-06HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-04HouseReported as committed
2019-02-01HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=350
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0350&pn=0276
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0350&pn=0566
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0350&pn=0879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=02/04/2019&RollCallId=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=50
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=70
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=71
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=72
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/12/2019&RollCallId=109

Bill Comments

feedback