PA HB351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing for veto power by the Governor over certain actions; further providing for audits; and providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing for veto power by the Governor over certain actions; further providing for audits; and providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 351 PN 327, FP (Y: 175 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (175-16)
2019-03-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-26HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-18HouseReported as committed
2019-02-04HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback