PA HB356 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in charter schools, further providing for charter school requirements, for facilities and for school district and intermediate unit responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In charter schools, further providing for charter school requirements, for facilities and for school district and intermediate unit responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 356 PN 2109, FP (Y: 105 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 356 PN 1745, 2019 A1551, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 108 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 356 PN 1745, 2019 A1379, CIRESI (Y: 93 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 356 PN 1745, 2019 A1289, ISAACSON (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 356 PN 1745, 2019 A1288, DONATUCCI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 356 PN 1745, 2019 A1717, TOPPER (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (105-91)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-13HouseReported as committed
2019-05-07HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=356
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0356&pn=1745
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0356&pn=2109
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=408
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=409
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=410
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=428
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=765

Bill Comments

feedback