PA HB358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education; and, in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for definitions, for responsibilities of school entities and for concurrent enrollment agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, further providing for agreements with institutions of higher education; and, in opportunities for educational excellence, further providing for definitions, for responsibilities of school entities and for concurrent enrollment agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 358 PN 1747, FP (Y: 142 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 358 PN 1747, 2019 A1699, MCCARTER (Y: 93 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (142-54)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-13HouseReported as committed
2019-05-07HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=358
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0358&pn=1747
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=494
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=412
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=429
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=767

Bill Comments

feedback